NJ A3957 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2362 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2362 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2020 supplemental Grants-in-Aid appropriation of $5 million to DCA for NJSHARES - S.M.A.R.T. Program.
Title
Makes FY 2020 supplemental Grants-in-Aid appropriation of $5 million to DCA for NJSHARES - S.M.A.R.T. Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2362 (1R) |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3957 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2362 (1R)
S2362 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.123.
S2362 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.123.