NJ A3965 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands existing EDA loan program to include certain small producers and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Expands existing EDA loan program to include certain small producers and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2463 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2463 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2463 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A3965 (1R)