NJ A3971 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of "coronavirus relief bonds" by municipalities and counties.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of "coronavirus relief bonds" by municipalities and counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2475 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2475 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.74. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-13) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-23-1) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-14) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2475 |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-20-3) |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2475 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A3971 (1R)