NJ A40 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases New Jersey Earned Income Tax Credit to 40 percent of federal benefit amount beginning in Tax Year 2016.
Title
Increases New Jersey Earned Income Tax Credit to 40 percent of federal benefit amount beginning in Tax Year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-22-4) |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A40 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2051 (Same As) 2016-04-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2051 (Same As) 2016-04-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A40 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/40_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A40 |