NJ A4034 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2340 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Governor to permit mortgage forbearance and rent payment Provides mortgage payment relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for resident property owners, tenants and other consumers, economically impacted during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Governor to permit mortgage forbearance and rent payment Provides mortgage payment relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for resident property owners, tenants and other consumers, economically impacted during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted by S2340 (2R)
2020-07-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-27AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-06-15AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2340 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback