NJ A4098 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S2660 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes grant program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics; appropriates $5 million to DOE.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes grant program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics; appropriates $5 million to DOE.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted by S2660 (SCS/1R)
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-06-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2660 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.256.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback