NJ A4110 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S419
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-25 - Approved P.L.2018, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-25 - Approved P.L.2018, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain school buses to be equipped with lap and shoulder seat belts.
Title
Requires certain school buses to be equipped with lap and shoulder seat belts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S233 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-25 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.118. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S233 |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-4) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S233 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4110 (1R)
S419 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S419 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee