NJ A4115 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.232.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that certain students are eligible for NJ STARS and NJ STARS II scholarship upon initial enrollment at institution of higher education on part-time basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies that certain students are eligible for NJ STARS and NJ STARS II scholarship upon initial enrollment at institution of higher education on part-time basis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2787 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.232.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted for S2787
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-10-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2787 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A4115

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback