NJ A4126 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits local units and authorities to waive interest and lien enforcement for certain delinquent water and sewer utility payments during emergency circumstances.
Title
Permits local units and authorities to waive interest and lien enforcement for certain delinquent water and sewer utility payments during emergency circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2526 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.39. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Substituted for S2526 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2526 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Substituted by A4126 (1R)