NJ A4132 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved P.L.2020, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved P.L.2020, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns benefits provided to workers.
Title
Concerns benefits provided to workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2350 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2350 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.57. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-16) |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-25-2) |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Motion Suspend Rule 22:4a (Voice) (Downey) |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Pou) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Substituted for S2350 (2R) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (80-0-0) (Taliaferro) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Taliaferro) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2350 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A4132 (2R)