NJ A4134 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3099
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*
Title
"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2891 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2891 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.56. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-20-1) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-6) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2891 (2R) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-24-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (50-26-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bucco) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3099 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2891 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4134 (2R)
S3141 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2891 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4134 (2R)
S3141 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee