NJ A4150 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1022
Note: Carry Foward to future A3592
Note: Carry Foward to future A3592
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.479.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.479.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires meeting between student and appropriate school personnel after multiple suspensions or proposed expulsion from public school to identify behavior or health difficulties.*
Title
Requires meeting between student and appropriate school personnel after multiple suspensions or proposed expulsion from public school to identify behavior or health difficulties.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2742 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2742 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.479. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2742 (1R) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4150 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.479.
A4150 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.479.
S2742 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4150 (2R)
A4150 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.479.
S2742 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4150 (2R)