NJ A4157 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2674 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2674 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.
Title
Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2674 (1R) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2674 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.83.