NJ A4169 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.
Title
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.84. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2647 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2647 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4169