NJ A4175 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey COVID-19 Emergency Bond Act," authorizes issuance of State bonds totaling up to $9.9 billion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey COVID-19 Emergency Bond Act," authorizes issuance of State bonds totaling up to $9.9 billion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2697 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-16AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.60.
2020-07-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-26-0)
2020-07-16AssemblyMotion To Table (45-25-2) (Johnson)
2020-07-16AssemblyMotion To Aa (Holley)
2020-07-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-07-16SenatePassed by the Senate (22-15)
2020-07-16SenateMotion To Table Sa (13-11) (Weinberg)
2020-07-16SenateMotion To Sa (Rice)
2020-07-16SenateSubstituted for S2697
2020-07-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-06-04AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-28-0)
2020-06-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-05-28AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2697 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - Substituted by A4175 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback