NJ A4177 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows county homelessness trust funds to be used for code blue emergency shelter services.
Title
Allows county homelessness trust funds to be used for code blue emergency shelter services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2737 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2737 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.53. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-2-4) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2737 (1R) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2737 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4177 (1R)