NJ A4188 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.
Title
Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2656 |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2656 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.284.