NJ A4193 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.
Title
Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2860 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2860 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-17-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2860 (2R) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Norcross) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-25-5) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2860 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4193 (2R)