NJ A4202 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to establish and maintain hotline for persons with disability for use during emergency of disaster.
Title
Requires Department of Human Services to establish and maintain hotline for persons with disability for use during emergency of disaster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2632 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading