NJ A4205 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.229.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.229.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enters New Jersey into Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Title
Enters New Jersey into Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2506 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2506 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.229. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S2506 (1R) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2506 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4205 (1R)