NJ A4208 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2517 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2517 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program to adopt paratransit best practices, requires greater coordination among paratransit service providers, and establishes regional paratransit coordinating councils.
Title
Establishes program to adopt paratransit best practices, requires greater coordination among paratransit service providers, and establishes regional paratransit coordinating councils.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2517 (1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2517 (Same As) 2020-10-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.114.