NJ A4210 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $15,294,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $15,294,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2728 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.86.
2018-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted for S2728
2018-06-21SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2728 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4210

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback