NJ A4239 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A351
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Developmental Disabilities, during publichealth emergency, to develop guidance for in-person visitation at community-based residential settings for individuals with developmental disabilities and require providers to allow such visitation.
Title
Requires Division of Developmental Disabilities, during publichealth emergency, to develop guidance for in-person visitation at community-based residential settings for individuals with developmental disabilities and require providers to allow such visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4239 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2574 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2574 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee