NJ A4240 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2142
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for technological upgrade of application process for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
Provides for technological upgrade of application process for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2855 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2855 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.93. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2855 (1R) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4240 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.93.
S2855 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4240 (2R)
S2855 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4240 (2R)