NJ A4261 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.
Title
Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2794 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-15) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Substituted for S2794 (1R) |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-27-2) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2794 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A4261 (1R)