NJ A4264 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S2486 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S2486 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Clayton Model Pilot Program in DOE to provide school-based social emotional learning to students in grades kindergarten through five at certain public schools.
Title
Establishes Clayton Model Pilot Program in DOE to provide school-based social emotional learning to students in grades kindergarten through five at certain public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2486 (2R) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2486 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.85.