NJ A431 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1224
Note: Carry Over of previous A1635
Note: Carry Over of previous A1635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A431 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1635 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1635 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A431 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/431_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A431 |