NJ A4310 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2804 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires young children entering public schools or Head Start Programs for first time to have comprehensive eye examination completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires young children entering public schools or Head Start Programs for first time to have comprehensive eye examination completed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted by S2804 (1R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-07-30AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2804 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback