NJ A4312 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S556
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates use of body cameras worn by law enforcement officers.
Title
Regulates use of body cameras worn by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S101 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S101 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.129. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-4-6) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S101 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-4-7) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S101 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4312
S556 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S556 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee