NJ A4315 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S19 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S19 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as State and public holiday, third Friday in June as Juneteenth Day.
Title
Designates, as State and public holiday, third Friday in June as Juneteenth Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S19 (1R) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S19 (Same As) 2020-09-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.76.