NJ A4369 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements sentencing recommendations of the Criminal Sentencing and Disposition Commission to eliminate certain mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment; eliminates mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for crime of official misconduct.
Title
Implements sentencing recommendations of the Criminal Sentencing and Disposition Commission to eliminate certain mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment; eliminates mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for crime of official misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2586 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2586 (1R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-19-3) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2586 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4369 (2R)
A5266 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3363 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5266 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3363 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee