NJ A4415 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.303.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.303.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Seal of Biliteracy to recognize high school graduates who have attained a high level of bilingual proficiency.
Title
Establishes State Seal of Biliteracy to recognize high school graduates who have attained a high level of bilingual proficiency.
Sponsors
Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3279 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3279 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.303. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted for S3279 (1R) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Turner) |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-0) |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3279 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A4415 (2R)