NJ A4416 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits sale or distribution of products containing asbestos.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits sale or distribution of products containing asbestos.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3262 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.114.
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted for S3262 (1R)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3262 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4416 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback