NJ A4430 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Linda's Law"; prohibits electric public utilities from discontinuing service to customers using life-sustaining equipment with verification of use of equipment.
Title
"Linda's Law"; prohibits electric public utilities from discontinuing service to customers using life-sustaining equipment with verification of use of equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3029 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3029 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.154. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3029 (1R) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Vitale) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3029 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4430/4555 (ACS/1R)