NJ A4435 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.323.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.323.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCF to give priority to certain school districts with student mental health counseling centers in awarding grants under School Based Youth Services Program.
Title
Requires DCF to give priority to certain school districts with student mental health counseling centers in awarding grants under School Based Youth Services Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2717 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2717 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.323. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-11-08 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2717 (1R) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-2) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2717 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A4435 (2R)