NJ A4442 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes individuals who have passed road test to use driving permit to operate motor vehicle for 60 days during COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Authorizes individuals who have passed road test to use driving permit to operate motor vehicle for 60 days during COVID-19 public health emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2755 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.136. |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2755 |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2755 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4442 (1R)