NJ A4446 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain provisions in State contracts for delivery of publicly financed mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Title
Requires certain provisions in State contracts for delivery of publicly financed mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2708 |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2708 (Same As) 2021-01-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.1.