NJ A4449 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crime of soliciting transfer of firearm by disqualified person.
Title
Establishes crime of soliciting transfer of firearm by disqualified person.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2808 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.166. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2808 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-4-3) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2808 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4449