NJ A4460 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2358
Note: Carry Over of previous A4075
Note: Carry Over of previous S2841
Note: Carry Over of previous A4075
Note: Carry Over of previous S2841
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from six to 12 months compensation program for injured law enforcement officers and other employees; revises type of injury needed to qualify for program.
Title
Extends from six to 12 months compensation program for injured law enforcement officers and other employees; revises type of injury needed to qualify for program.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4460 (Carry Over) 2020-07-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1864 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4075 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2841 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1864 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4075 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2841 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4460 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4500/4460_I1.HTM |