NJ A4461 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to enter into contract and coordinate with certain cooperative purchasing systems for procurement of COVID-19 related goods and services by school districts.
Title
Requires State to enter into contract and coordinate with certain cooperative purchasing systems for procurement of COVID-19 related goods and services by school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2698 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2698 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.77. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Ruiz) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2698 (1R) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2698 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4461 (2R)