NJ A4475 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires county boards of election to establish ballot drop boxes in each county at least 45 days before election: revises procedures concerning mail-in ballots for 2020 general election.
Title
Requires county boards of election to establish ballot drop boxes in each county at least 45 days before election: revises procedures concerning mail-in ballots for 2020 general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2580 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.72. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-13) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-28-0) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Motion Susp22:4(48-28-0)(Reynolds-Jackson) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-14) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Corrado) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2580 (2R) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-28-0) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Motion To Table (50-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Auth) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Motion To Table (50-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bramnick) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2580 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4475 (2R)