NJ A4476 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2284
Note: Carry Foward to future S818
Note: Carry Foward to future S818
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits transmittal of certain proposed county ordinances by electronic mail.
Title
Permits transmittal of certain proposed county ordinances by electronic mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4476 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4476 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3037 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4476 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3037 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading