NJ A4477 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2920 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2920 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes funding allocations for constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for Fiscal Year 2020and thereafter and revises law for State's open space, farmland, and historic preservation programs; appropriates $500,000.*
Title
Establishes funding allocations for constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for Fiscal Year 2020and thereafter and revises law for State's open space, farmland, and historic preservation programs; appropriates $500,000.*
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2920 (2R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2920 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.136.