NJ A4479 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S904
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2788 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2788 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental payments to long-term care facility staff providing direct care services during COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Provides supplemental payments to long-term care facility staff providing direct care services during COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2788 (1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4479 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2788 (1R)
S2788 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S2788 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate