NJ A4482 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.262.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Violence Against Persons with Developmental Disabilities" in DHS.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Violence Against Persons with Developmental Disabilities" in DHS.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3021 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.262.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted for S3021 (1R)
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-01-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3021 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A4482 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback