NJ A4484 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.294.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.294.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Long-Term Care Ombudsman to establish long-term care advocacy and educational training program.
Title
Requires State Long-Term Care Ombudsman to establish long-term care advocacy and educational training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.294. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3153 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3153 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4484 (1R)