NJ A4493 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2134
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.336.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.336.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expedited partner therapy, under which sexual partners or patients diagnosed with sexually transmitted disease are treated without prior clinical examination.
Title
Authorizes expedited partner therapy, under which sexual partners or patients diagnosed with sexually transmitted disease are treated without prior clinical examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S993 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.336. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S993 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S993 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A4493 (1R)
S2134 (Carry Over) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2134 (Carry Over) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee