NJ A4500 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NJ State Council on Arts to create and disseminate best practices guide for at-risk youth arts programs; requires council to assist government entities creating programs that adopt best practices.
Title
Directs NJ State Council on Arts to create and disseminate best practices guide for at-risk youth arts programs; requires council to assist government entities creating programs that adopt best practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3119 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.115. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3119 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3119 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4500