NJ A4508 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certain fees charged by, and requirements imposed on, check casher licensees.*
Title
Modifies certain fees charged by, and requirements imposed on, check casher licensees.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3083 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3083 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-12) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3083 (1R) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-17-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3083 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4508 (1R)