NJ A4511 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for immediate transport of persons by local law enforcement officers under certain circumstances.
Title
Allows for immediate transport of persons by local law enforcement officers under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-17-5) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |